NY A09229 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.364
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to maintaining up-to-date photographs of sex offenders subsequent to release.
Title
Relates to maintaining up-to-date photographs of sex offenders subsequent to release.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Senate | signed chap.364 |
2012-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1316 |
2012-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7569 |
2012-06-06 | Senate | REFERRED TO CRIME VICTIMS, CRIME AND CORRECTION |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.56 |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | rules report cal.56 |
2012-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2012-02-07 | Assembly | referred to correction |
Same As/Similar To
S07569 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9229