NY A09223 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.286
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.286
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to tax abatement for rent-controlled and rent regulated property occupied by senior citizens or persons with disabilities; relates to providing notice to those eligible of the need for reapplication.
Title
Relates to tax abatement for rent-controlled and rent regulated property occupied by senior citizens or persons with disabilities; relates to providing notice to those eligible of the need for reapplication.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Senate | signed chap.286 |
2012-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1360 |
2012-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6591A |
2012-05-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2012-05-09 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-05-09 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-05-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.525 |
2012-05-01 | Assembly | reported |
2012-04-19 | Assembly | print number 9223a |
2012-04-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2012-04-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-02-07 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S06591 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9223A