NY A09215 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-6)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s8192
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s8192
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Ensures that public retirees are not having their skilled nursing care benefits reduced under the state health benefit plan at the time they enroll for medicare.
Title
Ensures that public retirees are not having their skilled nursing care benefits reduced under the state health benefit plan at the time they enroll for medicare.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-31 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s8192 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | rules report cal.555 |
2022-06-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-05-27 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2022-02-09 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S08192 (Same As) 2022-12-16 - VETOED MEMO.130