NY A09193 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s4954c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-01 - substituted by s4954c
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases penalties for fraud which occurs in connection with an abnormal disruption of the market.
Title
Increases penalties for fraud which occurs in connection with an abnormal disruption of the market.
Sponsors
Asm. Nily Rozic [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Assembly | substituted by s4954c |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.560 |
2022-04-25 | Assembly | reported |
2022-03-29 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | print number 9193b |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | print number 9193a |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2022-02-09 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S04954 (Same As) 2022-12-28 - SIGNED CHAP.803