NY A09181 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-10 - substituted by s7863a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-10 - substituted by s7863a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires electric space heaters to have thermostats, automatic shut-offs and be certified by a testing and certification body recognized and approved by the United States department of labor, occupational safety and health administration.
Title
Requires electric space heaters to have thermostats, automatic shut-offs and be certified by a testing and certification body recognized and approved by the United States department of labor, occupational safety and health administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Assembly | substituted by s7863a |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | amended on third reading 9181b |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.559 |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | reported |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | print number 9181a |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | amend and recommit to consumer affairs and protection |
2022-02-09 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S07863 (Same As) 2022-12-08 - SIGNED CHAP.664