NY A09171 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - signed chap.120
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-21 - signed chap.120
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to NY ABLE account ownership, contributions and distributions.
Title
Relates to NY ABLE account ownership, contributions and distributions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-21 | Senate | signed chap.120 |
2016-07-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1982 |
2016-06-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8101 |
2016-06-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.447 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.447 |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | reported |
2016-06-15 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | print number 9171a |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to ways and means |
2016-02-09 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S06397 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES
S08101 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9171A
S08101 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9171A