NY A09169 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-20 - signed chap.388
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-20 - signed chap.388
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires information concerning services for human trafficking victims in Port Authority airports.
Title
Requires information concerning services for human trafficking victims in Port Authority airports.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. Steven Otis [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Assembly - Assembly Corporations, Authorities And Commissions Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-20 | Assembly | signed chap.388 |
2022-07-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.633 |
2022-05-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8262 |
2022-02-14 | Senate | REFERRED TO TRANSPORTATION |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-02-14 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-02-10 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.415 |
2022-02-08 | Assembly | reported |
2022-02-02 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S08262 (Same As) 2022-05-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9169