NY A09158 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-30 - substituted by s3141a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-05-30 - substituted by s3141a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the mobile and manufactured home replacement program to eliminate older mobile and manufactured homes and replace them with new manufactured, modular or site-built homes; makes related provisions.
Title
Establishes the mobile and manufactured home replacement program to eliminate older mobile and manufactured homes and replace them with new manufactured, modular or site-built homes; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Asm. Didi Barrett [D] | Asm. Aileen Gunther [D] | Asm. Angelo Santabarbara [D] | Asm. Christopher Eachus [D] |
Asm. Carrie Woerner [D] | Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-28 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Housing Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-30 | Assembly | substituted by s3141a |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.187 |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | rules report cal.187 |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | reported |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | print number 9158a |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | amend and recommit to housing |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | referred to housing |
Same As/Similar To
S03141 (Same As) 2024-12-21 - VETOED MEMO.131