NY A09143 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - print number 9143b
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - print number 9143b
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the New York state private not-for-profit special education schools revolving loan fund to provide zero interest loans to private not-for-profit special education schools in NYC to cover a portion of tuition costs for up to two years; appropriates two hundred million dollars.
Title
Creates the New York state private not-for-profit special education schools revolving loan fund to provide zero interest loans to private not-for-profit special education schools in NYC to cover a portion of tuition costs for up to two years; appropriates two hundred million dollars.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | Assembly | print number 9143b |
2022-03-04 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2022-02-09 | Assembly | print number 9143a |
2022-02-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S07665 (Same As) 2022-01-05 - REFERRED TO FINANCE