NY A09143 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.455
Hearing: Feb 8 @ 7:00 pm Assembly Aging Committee Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on November 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-28 - signed chap.455
Hearing: Feb 8 @ 7:00 pm Assembly Aging Committee Hearing
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the office for the aging to conduct a public education campaign relating to elder abuse.
Title
Authorizes the office for the aging to conduct a public education campaign relating to elder abuse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-28 | Senate | signed chap.455 |
2016-11-16 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2016-06-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2016-06-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1506 |
2016-06-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6923 |
2016-06-06 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2016-06-06 | Senate | returned to senate |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | amended on third reading 9143a |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2016-06-01 | Senate | recalled from senate |
2016-05-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGING |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-05-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.612 |
2016-05-10 | Assembly | reported |
2016-02-08 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-29 | Assembly | referred to aging |
Same As/Similar To
S06923 (Same As) 2016-06-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9143A