NY A09132 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.74
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the department of health to convene a workgroup on rare diseases.
Title
Directs the department of health to convene a workgroup on rare diseases.
Sponsors
Asm. Amy Paulin [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.74 |
2020-04-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-02-05 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-02-05 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-02-05 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.385 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | substituted for a9132 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | referred to health |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.96 |
2020-01-10 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-02-05 | Assembly | substituted by s7172 |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.385 |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07172 (Same As) 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.74