NY A09122 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-14)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-04 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public school students to be screened for eating disorders.
Title
Requires public school students to be screened for eating disorders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-04 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2012-06-07 | Assembly | print number 9122a |
2012-06-07 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2012-01-25 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S03142 (Same As) 2012-03-19 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES