NY A09116 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - signed chap.372
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-23 - signed chap.372
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to abandoned property delivered to the state and held by the state comptroller.
Title
Relates to abandoned property delivered to the state and held by the state comptroller.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-16 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-23 | Senate | signed chap.372 |
2014-09-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-16 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-16 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-16 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1406 |
2014-06-16 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7147 |
2014-04-09 | Senate | REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-04-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-04-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.549 |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | reported |
2014-03-18 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S07147 (Same As) 2014-06-16 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9116