NY A09116 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.285
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-1)
Status: Passed on August 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-01 - signed chap.285
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Increases certain special accidental death benefits paid to widows, widowers or the deceased member's children.
Title
Increases certain special accidental death benefits paid to widows, widowers or the deceased member's children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 126 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-01 | Senate | signed chap.285 |
2012-07-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-06-19 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-06-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-06-19 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1359 |
2012-06-19 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6438A |
2012-05-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-05-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-05-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.648 |
2012-05-22 | Assembly | reported |
2012-05-15 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2012-03-07 | Assembly | print number 9116a |
2012-03-07 | Assembly | amend and recommit to governmental employees |
2012-01-25 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06438 (Same As) 2012-06-19 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9116A