NY A09110 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-19 - substituted by s6134
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-06-19 - substituted by s6134
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the maximum award available under the historic preservation tax credit from five million dollars to twelve million dollars.
Title
Increases the maximum award available under the historic preservation tax credit from five million dollars to twelve million dollars.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-19 | Assembly | substituted by s6134 |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.350 |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | rules report cal.350 |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | reported |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2012-01-25 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S06134 (Same As) 2012-12-17 - VETOED MEMO.183