NY A09106 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-24 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-24 - REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS
Pending: Senate Civil Service and Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends the expiration of binding arbitration in the resolution of disputes in the course of collective negotiations; extends such provisions until July 1, 2019.
Title
Extends the expiration of binding arbitration in the resolution of disputes in the course of collective negotiations; extends such provisions until July 1, 2019.
Sponsors
Asm. Peter Abbate [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] | Asm. Jeffrion Aubry [D] | Asm. John Ceretto [R] |
Asm. Michael Cusick [D] | Asm. Steven Cymbrowitz [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Keith Wright [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-24 | Senate | REFERRED TO CIVIL SERVICE AND PENSIONS |
2016-02-24 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2016-02-24 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.382 |
2016-02-09 | Assembly | reported |
2016-02-02 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2016-01-27 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S06625 (Same As) 2016-06-17 - COMMITTED TO RULES