NY A09098 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-19 - signed chap.382
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-19 - signed chap.382
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to informational leaflets for maternity patients; requires certain annual statistical information to be presented on the department's website for the most recent five years for which such data is available.
Title
Relates to informational leaflets for maternity patients; requires certain annual statistical information to be presented on the department's website for the most recent five years for which such data is available.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-19 | Assembly | signed chap.382 |
2022-07-11 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1079 |
2022-05-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8751 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO HEALTH |
2022-03-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-03-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.458 |
2022-03-01 | Assembly | reported |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | print number 9098a |
2022-02-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S08751 (Same As) 2022-05-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9098A