NY A09094 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - print number 9094b
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-23 - print number 9094b
Pending: Assembly Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the office for the prevention of domestic violence to facilitate the establishment of five crime victim and trauma survivor recovery centers throughout the state to help individuals who have experienced violent crime, including individuals who suffered gunshot wounds, as well as victims of sexual assault, domestic violence, human trafficking, and hate crimes, and those who had a family member assaulted or killed, free of charge.
Title
Directs the office for the prevention of domestic violence to facilitate the establishment of five crime victim and trauma survivor recovery centers throughout the state to help individuals who have experienced violent crime, including individuals who suffered gunshot wounds, as well as victims of sexual assault, domestic violence, human trafficking, and hate crimes, and those who had a family member assaulted or killed, free of charge.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Assembly | print number 9094b |
2022-05-23 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | print number 9094a |
2022-05-06 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to governmental operations |
2022-01-31 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07537 (Same As) 2022-06-03 - COMMITTED TO RULES