NY A09091 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-07 - substituted by s8398
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the Iroquois central school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the Iroquois central school district to establish an insurance reserve fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-07Assemblysubstituted by s8398
2024-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.622
2024-06-07Assemblyreported
2024-06-03Assemblyreported referred to rules
2024-05-22Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2024-02-06Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S08398 (Same As) 2024-11-22 - SIGNED CHAP.515

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback