NY A09081 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-2)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - held for consideration in labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-05-17 - held for consideration in labor
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to a leave of absence for military spouses; removes the requirement that leave be used when a person's spouse is on leave while deployed to a combat theater or combat zone of operations.
Title
Relates to a leave of absence for military spouses; removes the requirement that leave be used when a person's spouse is on leave while deployed to a combat theater or combat zone of operations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-17 | Assembly | held for consideration in labor |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | print number 9081a |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | amend and recommit to labor |
2016-01-25 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S07095 (Same As) 2016-06-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES