NY A09072 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - substituted by s7398a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-11 - substituted by s7398a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a minimum of 36 hours of mandatory continuing education for psychologists to be completed every 3 years.
Title
Requires a minimum of 36 hours of mandatory continuing education for psychologists to be completed every 3 years.
Sponsors
Asm. Patricia Fahy [D] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] | Asm. John McDonald [D] | Asm. Michael Fitzpatrick [R] |
Asm. Rodneyse Bichotte Hermelyn [D] | Asm. Jo Simon [D] | Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] | Asm. Linda Rosenthal [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-11 | Assembly | substituted by s7398a |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.53 |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.53 |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-05 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-05-08 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-05-01 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-02-09 | Assembly | print number 9072a |
2018-02-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S07398 (Same As) 2018-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.436