NY A09063 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-07-06 - enacting clause stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the licensing of persons engaged in the design, construction, inspection, maintenance, alteration, and repair of elevators and other automated people moving devices; qualifies fund availability from the elevator and related conveyances safety program account; specifies what is not included in the definition of elevator work; sets forth qualifications and exemptions for licensing as an elevator agency technician; repeals certain sections of the labor law and the administrative code of the city of New York and changes the effective date for the licensing requirements of persons engaged in design, construction, inspection, maintenance, alteration and repair of elevators to two years after the act takes effect.
Title
Relates to the licensing of persons engaged in the design, construction, inspection, maintenance, alteration, and repair of elevators and other automated people moving devices; qualifies fund availability from the elevator and related conveyances safety program account; specifies what is not included in the definition of elevator work; sets forth qualifications and exemptions for licensing as an elevator agency technician; repeals certain sections of the labor law and the administrative code of the city of New York and changes the effective date for the licensing requirements of persons engaged in design, construction, inspection, maintenance, alteration and repair of elevators to two years after the act takes effect.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-06 | Assembly | enacting clause stricken |
2020-02-04 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S07306 (Same As) 2020-02-27 - referred to ways and means