NY A09053 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - advanced to third reading cal.721
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - advanced to third reading cal.721
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the location of certain wind electric generation facilities around Fort Drum.
Title
Relates to the location of certain wind electric generation facilities around Fort Drum.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Energy Committee: Favorable (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.721 |
2018-03-21 | Assembly | reported |
2018-03-13 | Assembly | print number 9053a |
2018-03-13 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to energy |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | referred to energy |