NY A09032 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-28 - signed chap.239
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to a license to sell liquor at retail for consumption on certain premises in the Town and Village of Mount Kisco, County of Westchester.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to a license to sell liquor at retail for consumption on certain premises in the Town and Village of Mount Kisco, County of Westchester.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-08-28Assemblysigned chap.239
2024-08-20Assemblydelivered to governor
2024-06-03SenateRETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
2024-06-03SenatePASSED SENATE
2024-06-03Senate3RD READING CAL.1413
2024-06-03SenateSUBSTITUTED FOR S8141A
2024-05-14SenateREFERRED TO INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS
2024-05-14Assemblydelivered to senate
2024-05-14Assemblypassed assembly
2024-05-09Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.470
2024-05-07Assemblyreported
2024-04-16Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2024-04-03Assemblyprint number 9032a
2024-04-03Assemblyamend (t) and recommit to economic development
2024-02-05Assemblyreferred to economic development

Same As/Similar To

S08141 (Same As) 2024-06-03 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9032A

New York State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A9032
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09032&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09032
Texthttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09032&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#A09032A
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09032&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC1
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09032&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AC2
Roll Callhttps://assembly.state.ny.us/leg/?default_fld=&bn=A09032&term=2023&Summary=Y&Actions=Y&Text=Y&Committee%26nbspVotes=Y&Floor%26nbspVotes=Y#AF1
Roll Callhttps://www.nysenate.gov/legislation/bills/2023/A9032#SF1

Bill Comments

feedback