NY A09032 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-26 - advanced to third reading cal.802
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-05-26 - advanced to third reading cal.802
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to changes in energy service pricing.
Title
Relates to changes in energy service pricing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.802 |
2016-05-24 | Assembly | reported |
2016-01-19 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S06798 (Same As) 2016-02-23 - REFERRED TO CONSUMER PROTECTION