NY A09006 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-02 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to making an appropriation to pay Thomas M. Clark Jr., widower of the late Barbara M. Clark, member of the assembly from the thirty-third assembly district, the balance due of her unpaid annual compensation for a portion of the year 2016.
Title
Relates to making an appropriation to pay Thomas M. Clark Jr., widower of the late Barbara M. Clark, member of the assembly from the thirty-third assembly district, the balance due of her unpaid annual compensation for a portion of the year 2016.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-02 | Senate | tabled |
2018-03-02 | Senate | vetoed memo.1 |
2018-02-20 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-02-13 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-13 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-13 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.486 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7430 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.3 |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | rules report cal.3 |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-01-12 | Assembly | referred to ways and means |
Same As/Similar To
S07430 (Same As) 2018-02-13 - SUBSTITUTED BY A9006