NY A09004 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-8)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-29 - REFERRED TO FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the office of the advocate for people with disabilities to advocate on behalf of persons with disabilities and assure that persons with disabilities are afforded the opportunity to exercise all of the rights and responsibilities accorded to citizens of the state of New York.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the office of the advocate for people with disabilities to advocate on behalf of persons with disabilities and assure that persons with disabilities are afforded the opportunity to exercise all of the rights and responsibilities accorded to citizens of the state of New York.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-29SenateREFERRED TO FINANCE
2020-01-29Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-01-29Assemblypassed assembly
2020-01-23Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.348
2020-01-22Assemblyreported
2020-01-22Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2020-01-10Assemblyreferred to governmental operations

Same As/Similar To

S07570 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - REFERRED TO FINANCE

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback