NY A08998 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-03 - substituted by s4550b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-03 - substituted by s4550b
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enacts the "schools impacted by gross highways (SIGH) act"; prohibits the commissioner of education from approving the plans for the erection of any new schoolhouse within five hundred feet of a controlled-access highway unless the commissioner of education determines that space limitations are so severe that there is no other site to erect such new schoolhouse, and there are adequate engineering controls to address air quality; makes related provisions.
Title
Enacts the "schools impacted by gross highways (SIGH) act"; prohibits the commissioner of education from approving the plans for the erection of any new schoolhouse within five hundred feet of a controlled-access highway unless the commissioner of education determines that space limitations are so severe that there is no other site to erect such new schoolhouse, and there are adequate engineering controls to address air quality; makes related provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s4550b |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.338 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-05-18 | Assembly | print number 8998b |
2024-05-18 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | print number 8998a |
2024-04-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to transportation |
2024-02-01 | Assembly | referred to transportation |
Same As/Similar To
S04550 (Same As) 2024-12-21 - SIGNED CHAP.650