NY A08991 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - signed chap.496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-12-17 - signed chap.496
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to coverage for volunteer firefighters and volunteer ambulance workers performing emergency services.
Title
Relates to coverage for volunteer firefighters and volunteer ambulance workers performing emergency services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-11 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-12-17 | Senate | signed chap.496 |
2014-12-05 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2014-06-11 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-06-11 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-06-11 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1164 |
2014-06-11 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7084 |
2014-05-27 | Senate | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.711 |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | reported |
2014-03-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2014-03-06 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07084 (Same As) 2014-06-11 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8991