NY A08974 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - SIGNED CHAP.14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - SIGNED CHAP.14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that all single-occupancy bathrooms in state-owned or operated buildings and office space be designated as gender neutral.
Title
Requires that all single-occupancy bathrooms in state-owned or operated buildings and office space be designated as gender neutral.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.14 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-01-28 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-28 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-01-28 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.341 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | substituted for a8974 |
2020-01-13 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.16 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | substituted by s6937 |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.341 |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S06937 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - SIGNED CHAP.14