NY A08968 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - substituted by s6945
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires local veterans' service agencies to provide information to the division of veterans' services on an annual basis.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires local veterans' service agencies to provide information to the division of veterans' services on an annual basis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Veterans' Affairs Committee: Favorable (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-03Assemblysubstituted by s6945
2020-01-30Assemblyadvanced to third reading cal.371
2020-01-28Assemblyreported
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to veterans' affairs
2020-01-06Assemblyreferred to veterans' affairs

Same As/Similar To

S06945 (Same As) 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.48

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback