NY A08961 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - substituted by s7322
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - substituted by s7322
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the establishment of the adolescent suicide prevention advisory council.
Title
Relates to the establishment of the adolescent suicide prevention advisory council.
Sponsors
Asm. Carmen De La Rosa [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Asm. David Weprin [D] | Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] |
Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Mental Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Assembly | substituted by s7322 |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.806 |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | referred to mental health |
Same As/Similar To
S07322 (Same As) 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.381