NY A08957 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on February 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-01 - signed chap.8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Passed on February 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-01 - signed chap.8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the public service department undertaking a comprehensive and regular management and operations audit of the Long Island power authority.
Title
Relates to the public service department undertaking a comprehensive and regular management and operations audit of the Long Island power authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-01-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Senate | signed chap.8 |
2012-01-31 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2012-01-30 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-30 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2012-01-30 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.20 |
2012-01-30 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6136 |
2012-01-18 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2012-01-18 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2012-01-18 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2012-01-12 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.306 |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | reported |
2012-01-04 | Assembly | referred to corporations, authorities and commissions |
Same As/Similar To
S06136 (Same As) 2012-01-30 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8957