NY A08957 | 2009-2010 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 42-2)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-13 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-04-13 - reported referred to ways and means
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for additional family court judges in the city of New York and in the counties of Albany, Broome, Chautauqua, Chemung, Erie, Monroe, Nassau, Niagara, Oneida, Oswego, St. Lawrence, Schenectady, Suffolk and Westchester.
Title
Provides for additional family court judges in the city of New York and in the counties of Albany, Broome, Chautauqua, Chemung, Erie, Monroe, Nassau, Niagara, Oneida, Oswego, St. Lawrence, Schenectady, Suffolk and Westchester.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2010-02-11 | print number 8957a | |
2010-02-11 | amend and recommit to judiciary | |
2010-01-06 | referred to judiciary | |
2009-06-18 | reported referred to ways and means | |
2009-06-16 | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S5968-A (Same As) 2010-06-22 - referred to ways and means