NY A08953 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - signed chap.62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - signed chap.62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to maternal depression treatment; requires the department of health and office of mental health to provide information on their website regarding how to locate available providers who treat or provide support for maternal depression.
Title
Relates to maternal depression treatment; requires the department of health and office of mental health to provide information on their website regarding how to locate available providers who treat or provide support for maternal depression.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | signed chap.62 |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-02-28 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-28 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.536 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7409 |
2018-02-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.630 |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07409 (Same As) 2018-02-28 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8953