NY A08952 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - substituted by s7320
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-07 - substituted by s7320
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the educational preparation for practice of professional nursing and to the nursing program evaluation commission; authorizes the department to issue a temporary educational exemption; requires the commission to make recommendations on the impact of requirements for achievement of a baccalaureate degree in any lesser period of time than required by law as condition to maintaining employment.
Title
Relates to the educational preparation for practice of professional nursing and to the nursing program evaluation commission; authorizes the department to issue a temporary educational exemption; requires the commission to make recommendations on the impact of requirements for achievement of a baccalaureate degree in any lesser period of time than required by law as condition to maintaining employment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-24 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-07 | Assembly | substituted by s7320 |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.804 |
2018-04-24 | Assembly | reported |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S07320 (Same As) 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.380