NY A08950 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - SIGNED CHAP.16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - SIGNED CHAP.16
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the time needed by small businesses and local governments to comply with new regulations.
Title
Relates to the time needed by small businesses and local governments to comply with new regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Operations Committee: Favorable (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.16 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-01-28 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-01-28 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-01-28 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.339 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | substituted for a8950 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | referred to governmental operations |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-13 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.107 |
2020-01-10 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | substituted by s7183 |
2020-01-23 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.339 |
2020-01-22 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S07183 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - SIGNED CHAP.16