NY A08947 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires notice to be provided of a home heating system conversion.
Title
Requires notice to be provided of a home heating system conversion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs And Protection Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-17 | Assembly | SIGNED CHAP.62 |
2020-04-17 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2020-02-03 | Senate | returned to senate |
2020-02-03 | Senate | passed assembly |
2020-02-03 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.360 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | substituted for a8947 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2020-01-15 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.33 |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-01-06 | Assembly | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | substituted by s6954 |
2020-01-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.360 |
2020-01-28 | Assembly | reported |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
2020-01-03 | Assembly | referred to consumer affairs and protection |
Same As/Similar To
S06954 (Same As) 2020-04-17 - SIGNED CHAP.62