NY A08947 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - substituted by s7311
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-12 - substituted by s7311
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing all students to participate in a high school graduation ceremony; requires any school board of education to develop policies and procedures to allow all students to participate in a high school graduation ceremony.
Title
Relates to allowing all students to participate in a high school graduation ceremony; requires any school board of education to develop policies and procedures to allow all students to participate in a high school graduation ceremony.
Sponsors
Sen. James Skoufis [D] | Asm. Rebecca Seawright [D] | Asm. Steven Englebright [D] | Asm. Felix Ortiz [D] |
Asm. William Colton [D] | Sen. Luis Sepulveda [D] | Asm. Christine Pellegrino [D] | Asm. Pamela Harris [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-12 | Assembly | substituted by s7311 |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.658 |
2018-02-06 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S07311 (Same As) 2018-04-18 - SIGNED CHAP.32