NY A08930 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - substituted by s2138
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-16 - substituted by s2138
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Includes coverage of treatment rendered by a massage therapist.
Title
Includes coverage of treatment rendered by a massage therapist.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-16 | Assembly | substituted by s2138 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | rules report cal.214 |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | reported |
2022-05-11 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S02138 (Same As) 2022-12-30 - VETOED MEMO.189