NY A08929 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - signed chap.49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - signed chap.49
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to requiring the president of the civil service commission, with the assistance of information technology services as needed, to prepare and deliver a triennial report relating to current programs within each state agency that allow for alternative work schedules or flexible work hours beginning September two thousand eighteen.
Title
Relates to requiring the president of the civil service commission, with the assistance of information technology services as needed, to prepare and deliver a triennial report relating to current programs within each state agency that allow for alternative work schedules or flexible work hours beginning September two thousand eighteen.
Sponsors
Asm. Nily Rozic [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | signed chap.49 |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2018-02-28 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2018-02-28 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2018-02-28 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.24 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S7296 |
2018-02-12 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2018-02-12 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.649 |
2018-02-05 | Assembly | reported |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S07296 (Same As) 2018-02-28 - SUBSTITUTED BY A8929