NY A08911 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-17 - print number 8911b
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-17 - print number 8911b
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the sale of flavored smokeless tobacco within five hundred feet of a public or private school; defines "flavored smokeless tobacco"; authorizes the commissioner to impose a civil penalty for violations.
Title
Prohibits the sale of flavored smokeless tobacco within five hundred feet of a public or private school; defines "flavored smokeless tobacco"; authorizes the commissioner to impose a civil penalty for violations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-17 | Assembly | print number 8911b |
2020-01-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to health |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | print number 8911a |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to health |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to health |
2019-12-30 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S07068 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO RULES