NY A08896 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relates to legalizing, validating, ratifying and confirming a transportation contract of the Cold Spring Harbor central school district.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relates to legalizing, validating, ratifying and confirming a transportation contract of the Cold Spring Harbor central school district.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-09SenateREFERRED TO RULES
2020-06-09Assemblydelivered to senate
2020-06-09Assemblypassed assembly
2020-06-09Assemblyordered to third reading rules cal.81
2020-06-09Assemblyrules report cal.81
2020-06-09Assemblyreported
2020-06-09Assemblyreported referred to rules
2020-06-06Assemblyreference changed to ways and means
2020-01-08Assemblyreferred to education
2019-12-30Assemblyreferred to education

Same As/Similar To

S07037 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO EDUCATION
S02977 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.130
A04944 (Same As) 2019-06-04 - substituted by s2977

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback