NY A08892 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-06-07 - substituted by s9300
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes the village of Clayton to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to Joshua David, a police officer employed by such village.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes the village of Clayton to offer an optional twenty year retirement plan to Joshua David, a police officer employed by such village.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-07Assemblysubstituted by s9300
2024-06-07Assemblyrules report cal.572
2024-06-07Assemblyreported
2024-06-07Assemblyreported referred to rules
2024-05-29Assemblyreported referred to ways and means
2024-01-26Assemblyreferred to governmental employees

Same As/Similar To

S09300 (Same As) 2024-11-22 - SIGNED CHAP.527

New York State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback