NY A08887 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school emergency response drills to include drills to respond to an active shooter, other lethal attackers, and attacks with explosives, or chemical, biological or radiological agents.
Title
Requires school emergency response drills to include drills to respond to an active shooter, other lethal attackers, and attacks with explosives, or chemical, biological or radiological agents.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Assembly | held for consideration in education |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | print number 8887a |
2018-02-08 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2018-01-05 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S06272 (Same As) 2018-06-20 - RECOMMITTED TO RULES