NY A08863 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-06 - held for consideration in education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Directs the education department to study, review and report on the placement of the county of Westchester in the Hudson Valley region for purposes of public school foundation aid, and the appropriateness of placing such county in the Long Island/New York city region for such purposes.
Title
Directs the education department to study, review and report on the placement of the county of Westchester in the Hudson Valley region for purposes of public school foundation aid, and the appropriateness of placing such county in the Long Island/New York city region for such purposes.
Sponsors
Asm. Sandra Galef [D] | Asm. Amy Paulin [D] | Asm. David Buchwald [D] | Sen. Shelley Mayer [D] |
Asm. Thomas Abinanti [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-06 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-06 | Assembly | held for consideration in education |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-12-22 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S06310 (Same As) 2018-06-11 - referred to education