NY A08855 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - ordered to third reading rules cal.407
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-19 - ordered to third reading rules cal.407
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires restaurants that offer online delivery services to post their most recent sanitary inspection grade on their website and/or any internet-based food delivery service websites where consumers can order from such food service establishment.
Title
Requires restaurants that offer online delivery services to post their most recent sanitary inspection grade on their website and/or any internet-based food delivery service websites where consumers can order from such food service establishment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 15 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Cities Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.407 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.407 |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | print number 8855e |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | amend and recommit to codes |
2018-06-08 | Assembly | print number 8855d |
2018-06-08 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to codes |
2018-05-30 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | print number 8855c |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to cities |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | print number 8855b |
2018-05-22 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to cities |
2018-03-28 | Assembly | print number 8855a |
2018-03-28 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to cities |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to cities |
2017-12-22 | Assembly | referred to cities |
Same As/Similar To
S08729 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - PRINT NUMBER 8729C