NY A08852 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - advanced to third reading cal.719
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-22 - advanced to third reading cal.719
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the summons with notice in a cause of action for personal injury or wrongful death to include a prayer for general relief.
Title
Requires the summons with notice in a cause of action for personal injury or wrongful death to include a prayer for general relief.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable (Y: 19 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.719 |
2018-03-20 | Assembly | reported |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | print number 8852b |
2018-02-28 | Assembly | amend and recommit to judiciary |
2018-02-09 | Assembly | print number 8852a |
2018-02-09 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to judiciary |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
2017-12-22 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S08918 (Same As) 2018-06-04 - REFERRED TO RULES