NY A08850 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 21 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-21 - REFERRED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that where the taxable status date is on or before April fourteenth, income tax year shall mean the twelve month period for which the owner or owners filed a federal personal income tax return for the year before the income tax year immediately preceding the date of application and where the taxable status date is on or after April fifteenth income tax year shall mean the twelve month period for which owner or owners filed a federal personal income tax return for the income tax year immediately preceding the date of application.
Title
Provides that where the taxable status date is on or before April fourteenth, income tax year shall mean the twelve month period for which the owner or owners filed a federal personal income tax return for the year before the income tax year immediately preceding the date of application and where the taxable status date is on or after April fifteenth income tax year shall mean the twelve month period for which owner or owners filed a federal personal income tax return for the income tax year immediately preceding the date of application.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-07-21 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-07-17 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Real Property Taxation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-21 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.245 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | rules report cal.245 |
2020-07-21 | Assembly | reported |
2020-07-17 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2020-02-25 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2020-01-08 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
2019-12-18 | Assembly | referred to real property taxation |
Same As/Similar To
S07009 (Same As) 2020-01-08 - REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT