NY A08846 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s7000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - substituted by s7000
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to allowing Wyoming county to make application to the Foreign Trade Zones Board for a grant to establish, operate and maintain a foreign trade zone or zones and foreign trade sub-zone or sub-zones within such county.
Title
Relates to allowing Wyoming county to make application to the Foreign Trade Zones Board for a grant to establish, operate and maintain a foreign trade zone or zones and foreign trade sub-zone or sub-zones within such county.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s7000 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | rules report cal.483 |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
2017-12-22 | Assembly | referred to local governments |
Same As/Similar To
S07000 (Same As) 2018-12-07 - SIGNED CHAP.370